Cazantzes v. Mowder et al.
Plaintiff: Eugene M. Cazantzes
Defendant: Elizabeth Mowder, Thomas Mowder, State of Ohio, U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, Stark County Treasurer and Alex Zumbar
Case Number: 5:2024cv00825
Filed: May 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2024 Filing 4 Motion for extension of time until July 10, 2024 to answer or otherwise plead filed by Defendant U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. Related document(s) #1 . (DeCaro, Sara)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motion #3 of Defendant U. S. Department of Housing and Urban Affairs for extension of time until June 10, 2024 to answer or otherwise plead. U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development answer due 6/10/2024. Judge David A. Ruiz on 05/17/2024. (K,SJ)
May 16, 2024 Filing 3 Motion for extension of time until June 10, 2024 to answer or otherwise plead filed by Defendant U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. Related document(s) #1 . (DeCaro, Sara)
May 8, 2024 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (F,AW)
May 8, 2024 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Stark County Probate Court, case number 248654 . Filing fee exempt. Filed by US Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons/Complaint, Exhibit B - Probate Docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (DeCaro, Sara)
May 8, 2024 Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (F,AW)
May 8, 2024 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes, Jr. (F,AW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cazantzes v. Mowder et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene M. Cazantzes
Represented By: Eugene M. Cazantzes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Mowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Mowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Sara E. DeCaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stark County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Zumbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?