Neal v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Carolyn A. Neal
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2008cv00512
Filed: August 5, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: HIGHLAND
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hogan
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS is ADOPTED and Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED consistent with the option by the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 8/10/10. (mr1)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting 16 and 18 Motion and Amended Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/28/2010. (ba1)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 16 , 18 AMENDED MOTION for fees be Granted and the Court award plaintiff fees in the amount of $3035.00 under the EAJA. Objections to R&R due by 1/4/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy S Hogan on 12/14/2009. (art)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS remanding and reversing the decision of the ALJ. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/21/2009. (ba1)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the ALJ's decision is not supported by substantial evidence and should be Reversed and Remanded pursuant to Sentence Four 42 USC 405(g) for further porceedings consistent with this decision. Objections to R&R due by 9/21/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy S Hogan on 9/2/2009. (art, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn A. Neal
Represented By: James Roy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?