Mays v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Joyce J Mays
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and SSA
Case Number: 1:2008cv00871
Filed: December 16, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: BUTLER
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING: 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 28 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Joyce J Mays. It is ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is hereby ADOPTED. Pursuant to the stipulation (Doc. 29) filed by the parties, Plaintiff is awarded $2,000.00 in fees and $350.00 in costs for a total award of $2,350.00. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/22/2011. (jlw1)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; this matter is reversed and remanded for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 12/10/10. (ba1)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this case be Reversed and Remanded for further proceedings pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 USC 405(g). Objections to R&R due by 11/26/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/8/2010. (art)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION denying 6 Motion to Dismiss; administrative transcript due 21 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/1/2010. (ba1)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Joyce J Mays, 6 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Commissioner of Social Security: that defendnat's motion to dismiss be DENIED and the plaintiff directed to file her Statement of Errors. Objections to R&R due by 2/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/3/10. (jl1) (jl1).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce J Mays
Represented By: Christine B Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?