University of Cincinnati Chapter of Young Americans for Liberty et al v. University of Cincinnati et al
Plaintiff: University of Cincinnati Chapter of Young Americans for Liberty and Christopher Morbitzer
Defendant: Gregory H Williams, Corinn Shemak, Cathy Krumpelbeck, Michael Cureton, John Doe and Brittany Sisko
Case Number: 1:2012cv00155
Filed: February 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 FINAL JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/22/12. (mr1)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER - The Court sua sponte orders Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' second set of interrogatories no later than July 5, 2012, one week before Defendants; memorandum in opposition is due. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/28/12. (mr1)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER - The Court concludes that no bond is appropriate in this case. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/27/12. (mr1)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: All parties shall meet and confer within 10 days of the date of this Order and jointly propose to the Court a new Calendar Order. The parties shall submit their proposed Calendar Order via email to black_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/12/12. (mr1)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER - Defendant Brittany Sisko's Motion to Vacate (Doc. 50 ) is GRANTED in PART. The Calendar Order (Doc. 12 ) is VACATED. The Court hereby sets ORAL ARGUMENT (only) on all pending motions on 5/30/12 at 10:30 a.m. in Cincinnati Courtroom #3. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 5/18/12. (mr1)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 10 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/22/12. (mr1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: University of Cincinnati Chapter of Young Americans for Liberty et al v. University of Cincinnati et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Cincinnati Chapter of Young Americans for Liberty
Represented By: Ryan Daniel Walters
Represented By: Maurice A Thompson
Represented By: Curt Carl Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Morbitzer
Represented By: Ryan Daniel Walters
Represented By: Maurice A Thompson
Represented By: Curt Carl Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory H Williams
Represented By: Robert Joseph Gehring
Represented By: Brian E Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corinn Shemak
Represented By: Robert Joseph Gehring
Represented By: Brian E Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Krumpelbeck
Represented By: Robert Joseph Gehring
Represented By: Brian E Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cureton
Represented By: Robert Joseph Gehring
Represented By: Brian E Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Sisko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?