Hiles v. NovaStar Mortgage, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Marshall G. Hiles
Defendant: NovaStar Mortgage, Inc., NovaStar Financial, Inc., Zurich American Insurance Company and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 1:2012cv00392
Filed: May 22, 2012
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART THE NOVASTAR DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND AN INJUNCTION (Doc. 53 ); AND (2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY (Doc. 55 ). Plaintiff is ENJOINED and prohibited from filing any additional motions in this case without leave of Court. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/5/2016. (mr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 27, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT (Docs. 38 / 41 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/27/2015. (mr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 10, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT AFFIRMING 24 DECISION AND ENTRY and 25 DECISION AND ENTRY. (mr1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hiles v. NovaStar Mortgage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall G. Hiles
Represented By: Eric C Deters
Represented By: Charles Theodore Lester, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NovaStar Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly A. Kosek
Represented By: John F Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NovaStar Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly A. Kosek
Represented By: John F Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Kelly A. Kosek
Represented By: John F Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Thomas A Barni
Represented By: Benjamin D Carnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?