Park v. Morgan et al
Plaintiff: Walter E. Park, III
Defendant: Donald Morgan and Larry Greene
Case Number: 1:2015cv00182
Filed: March 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: SCIOTO
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 5 and 9 Report and Recommendations dismissing 4 and 8 Complaint and Amended Compliant. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/25/15. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 4 complaint, as amended 8 be Dismissed with prejudice. Any appeal of this matter would not be taken in good faith, and therefore Deny plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 6/12/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 5/20/2015. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/10/2015. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. Plaintiff's 4 COMPLAINT be DISMISSED with prejudice. 2. The Court certify that an appeal of any Order adopting this Report a nd Recommendation would not be taken in good faith and therefore deny plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 4/27/2015. (eh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park v. Morgan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter E. Park, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?