Washington v. EverBank et al
Plaintiff: Jonna Washington
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC and EverBank
Case Number: 1:2015cv00354
Filed: May 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: CUYAHOGA
Presiding Judge: Sandra S Beckwith
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER denying 79 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 3/9/18. (wam)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott granting 52 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 54 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations re 73 Report and Recommendations.; granting 74 Motion for Discovery; this matter will proceed to trial on plaintiff's fraud claim and to determine the amount of damages for her RESPA and FDCPA claims; status/scheduling conference set for July 20, 2017 at 10:00 AM in Room 227. (vp)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment be Granted; Defendants' 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment be Denied; and that this matter proceed to trial on plaintiff's fraud claim and to determine the amount of damages for her RESPA and FDCPA claims. Objections to R&R due by 5/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 5/5/2017. (art)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER that 68 defendants' motion for leave to file their reply brief instanter is hereby Granted. The Court will consider defendants' reply brief 66 in ruling on defendants' motion for summary judgment. Accordingly, plaintiff 9;s 67 motion to strike is Denied. However, to ensure that plaintiff is not prejudiced by defendants' untimely filing, the Court will consider the substantive arguments in plaintiff's motion to strike when ruling on defendants' moti on for summary judgment. Therefore, the Clerk of Court is Directed to file a copy of plaintiff's motion to strike 67 as a sur-reply to defendants' motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/31/2017. (art)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting plaintiff's 50 Motion to File Exhibit P to her motion for summary judgment Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/24/2017. (art)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation 38 ;denying 28 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Sandra S. Beckwith on 12/2/16. (mb)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that defendants' 25 Motion for Protective Order is Denied as Moot. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 28 MOTION for Sanctions be Denied. ( Objections to R&R due by 11/3/2016). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 10/17/2016. (art)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. EverBank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonna Washington
Represented By: Audrey Balint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EverBank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?