Horter Investment Management, LLC v. Cutter et al
Plaintiff: Horter Investment Management, LLC
Defendant: Jeffrey Cutter, Pete A. Lang and PCM Advisory LLC
Counter_claimant: Pete A. Lang and Jeffrey Cutter
Counter_defendant: Horter Investment Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv00477
Filed: July 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Sandra S Beckwith
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K. Bowman
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 71 Jeffrey Cutter's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 72 "Borer/PCM" Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 6/15/17. (wam)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting in part 70 Motion to Strike Drew Horter's Errata Sheets. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 4/20/17. (wam)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 68 Defendant PCM Advisory's Motion to File Appendix 2 Under Seal. Signed by Judge Sandra S Beckwith on 8/1/16. (mb)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying [38 & 48] Boer's Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sandra S Beckwith on 1/28/16. (mb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horter Investment Management, LLC v. Cutter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horter Investment Management, LLC
Represented By: Matthew L Fornshell
Represented By: Kevin L Murch
Represented By: Nicole Rene Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Cutter
Represented By: Christopher P Fisher
Represented By: Pamela King Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete A. Lang
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Cioffi
Represented By: John P Curp
Represented By: Christopher P Fisher
Represented By: Pamela King Ginsburg
Represented By: Richard J. Morgan
Represented By: Benjamin E. Nicholson, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCM Advisory LLC
Represented By: Aaron Mark Herzig
Represented By: Danise A. McMahon
Represented By: Russell S Sayre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Pete A. Lang
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Cioffi
Represented By: John P Curp
Represented By: Christopher P Fisher
Represented By: Pamela King Ginsburg
Represented By: Richard J. Morgan
Represented By: Benjamin E. Nicholson, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Jeffrey Cutter
Represented By: Christopher P Fisher
Represented By: Pamela King Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Horter Investment Management, LLC
Represented By: Matthew L Fornshell
Represented By: Kevin L Murch
Represented By: Nicole Rene Woods
Represented By: Matthew L Fornshell
Represented By: Kevin L Murch
Represented By: Nicole Rene Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?