Bonds v. University of Cincinnati Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Todd Bonds
Defendant: University of Cincinnati Medical Center, University of Cincinnati Medical Center Security Staff and Mike Posey
Case Number: 1:2015cv00641
Filed: October 2, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER denying defendant Jack Conway's 186 Motion to declare plaintiff a vexatious litigator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/6/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER denying plaintiff's 164 Motion for Summary Judgment against defendant Conway; denying plaintiff's 165 Motion for Summary Judgment against defendants Caudill and Saint-Blancard; granting defendant Caudill and Saint-Blancard' s 166 Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting defendant Conway's 167 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 5/1/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER regarding Court's decision on discovery issues raised by the parties following the 152 Status Conference / Informal Discovery Conference held on 8/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/28/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER that plaintiff's 143 MOTION for leave to file a second amended complaint is Denied. The UCMC defendants' 130 Motion for judgment on the pleadings is Granted. Defendants UCMC, UCMC security staff, and Mike Posey are Dismissed fr om the case. Defendant Conway's 132 Motion for Protective Order is Granted in part. Plaintiff may take defendant Conway's oral deposition but the deposition must take place in the ADR Suite of the Courthouse Building in Cincinnati, Ohi o, and arrangements to use the ADR Suite must be made through the Court. Plaintiff's 136 Motion to Strike defendant Conway's motion for protective order is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/24/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER following 82 Informal Discovery Conference held on 12/21/2016- resolving the parties' discovery dispute 44 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/21/2016. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER dismissing plaintiff's amended complaint against the Office of the Attorney General of Kentucky, the Kentucky State Police, and the Commonwealth of Kentucky with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Counts I, II, VI and VII and Paragraph 12 (alleging a claim of conspiracy) of the amended complaint are DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's First A mendment retaliation claim (Counts III and V) against defendants UCMC, Posey, unknown UCMC security guard, UCMC security staff, the Office of the Attorney General of Kentucky, the Kentucky State Police, and the Commonwealth of Kent ucky is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's Fourth Amendment claim (Count IV) against the Office of the Attorney General of Kentucky, former Kentucky Attorney General Conway, the Kentucky State Police, and the Commonwealth of Kentucky is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. It is ORDERED that the United States Marshal serve a copy of the original complaint 3 and amended complaint 72 , a summons, and this Order upon defendants Two Unknown Kentucky State Police Officers and former Kentucky Attorney General Conway as directed by plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/23/16. (sct)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER denying plaintiff's 51 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 55 & 61 plaintiff's MOTIONS to Compel; and granting plaintiff's 65 Motion for leave to submit an amended complaint subject to sua sponte review of the amended complaint by the Court pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/18/2016. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified to correct document number text only on 11/18/2016 (art).
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER that defendants' 58 Motion to vacate the scheduling order and stay discovery is Granted. The scheduling order 19 is Vacated. Discovery is Stayed pending further Order of the Court. Plaintiff's 42 Motion to Compel is Denied; Plaintiff's 47 Motion to compel the release of his medical records is Denied; Plaintiff's 45 Motion to Appoint Counsel, and his 45 Motion to extend the scheduling order by (120) days is Denied a moot; and plaintiff's 59 Mot ion for the Clerk to provided non-party subpoenas for plaintiff to serve is Denied a moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 9/7/2016. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying plaintiff's 36 Motion to Compel; denying as moot plaintiff's 37 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Clerk is Directed to sent doc. 19 to plaintiff by regular mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/15/2016. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying as moot plaintiff's 26 Motion for Sanctions; and plaintiff's 27 Motion to Strike. The status conference in this matter is hereby reset for Thursday, 8/4/2016 at 2:00 pm via telphone before MJ Litkovitz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/9/2016. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonds v. University of Cincinnati Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Cincinnati Medical Center
Represented By: Richard L Moore
Represented By: Bill J Paliobeis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Cincinnati Medical Center Security Staff
Represented By: Richard L Moore
Represented By: Bill J Paliobeis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Posey
Represented By: Richard L Moore
Represented By: Bill J Paliobeis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?