Pfeffer v. National Credit Systems, Inc
Plaintiff: David Pfeffer
Defendant: National Credit Systems, Inc
Case Number: 1:2016cv00006
Filed: January 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: BUTLER
Presiding Judge: Sandra S Beckwith
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott DISMISSING CASE with prejudice; any of the parties may reopen action no later than August 26, 2018 if settlement is not consummated. (vp)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting plaintiff's 53 Motion to request mediation. By separate Order issued this date, this case will be referred to Attorney-Based Mediation pursuant to the Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/15/2018. (art)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ADOPTING 48 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS : Accordingly, defendants motion for summary judgment (Doc. 27) is GRANTED as to plaintiffs claim that defendant violated the bankruptcy stay. The motion is DENIED as to plaintiffs claims under the Fair Credit Reporting Act, the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act, and the Ohio Consumer Sales Practices Act. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 9/8/2017. (jlw)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendant's 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment be Granted as to plaintiff's claim that defendant violated the bankruptcy stay, but Denied as to plaintiff's claims under the FCRA, the FDCPA, and the OCSPA. Objections to R&R due by 9/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/18/2017. (art)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pfeffer v. National Credit Systems, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Pfeffer
Represented By: David J Fierst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Systems, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?