Borck v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Anke Borck
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00326
Filed: February 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: BUTLER
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K. Bowman
Presiding Judge: Susan J. Dlott
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Plaintiff's motion for an award of attoney's fees 17 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 4/30/2018. (jlw)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees pursuant to 42 USC 406(B). IS RECOMMENDED THAT: (1) Plaintiff's motion for an award of attorneys fees under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) 17 should be GRANTED in full; (2 ) Counsel should be paid a total of $2,970.00 for the 9 hours of work performed in this Court, subject to an offset of the EAJA fee previously paid to her for the same work. Therefore, counsel should be awarded an additional fee under 42 U.S.C. §406(b) of $1,485.00, reflecting the total award of $2,970.00 less the offset of $1,485.00. Objections to R&R due by 4/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 4/6/2018. (km)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the parties Joint Stipulation to Award Attorney Fees under the EAJA. Plaintiff is awarded $1,485 in fees and $0 for costs. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 12/22/2016. (jlw)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 12/12/16. It is RECOMMENDED THAT pursuant to the parties stipulation (Doc. 14 ), Plaintiff be awarded the total sum of $1,485.00 in attorneys fees and costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA). Objections to R&R due by 12/30/2016. (eh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borck v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anke Borck
Represented By: Lisa S Hollifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?