Prince et al v. National Labor Relations Board et al
Plaintiff: |
Earl Kelly Prince and Ingrid Prince |
Defendant: |
National Labor Relations Board, Director of FOIA, Harvey Roth, Roberto G. Chavarray, Vivian Robles, Deborah M.P. Yaffe and Peter Ohr |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00419 |
Filed: |
March 24, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Cincinnati Office |
County: |
HAMILTON |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael R. Barrett |
Presiding Judge: |
Karen L. Litkovitz |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 15, 2019 |
Filing
58
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 27 , 29 Report and Recommendations dismissing defendants Yaff, Solomon and Chavarry for failure of service. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/15/19. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
July 24, 2017 |
Filing
42
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 33 Report and Recommendation granting 21 United States' Motion to Dismiss; granting 23 National Labor Relations Board's Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting 24 Robles and Ohr's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 7/24/17. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
April 20, 2017 |
Filing
33
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the United States' 21 MOTION to Dismiss plaintiffs' FTCA claim be Granted for Failure to state a claim to relief; The NLRB's 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment as a matter of law on plaintiffs' FOIA claim be Granted; and Defendants Robles and Ohr's 24 MOTION TO DISMISS plaintiffs' claims be Granted. Any appeal of of this matter would not be taken in good faith, and therefore plaintiffs leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Obj ections to R&R due by 5/4/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/20/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified on 4/20/2017 (art).
|
February 9, 2017 |
Filing
29
SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND NOTICE to the 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiffs' 4 Complaint against defendants Yaffe, Solomon, and Chavarry be Dismissed without prejudice for failure of service. Objections to R&R due by 2/23/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/9/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
January 25, 2017 |
Filing
27
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiffs' 4 Complaint against defendants Yaffe, Solomon, and Chavarry be Dismissed without prejudice for failure of service. Objections to R&R due by 2/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/25/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?