Jones et al v. US Bank National Association, as Trustee for CSMC Mortgage Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-2 et al
Plaintiff: Derryn Nicole Jones and Dwight Earl Jones
Defendant: US Bank National Association, as Trustee for CSMC Mortgage Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-2, Lerner Sampson & Rothfuss, Matthew I. McKelvey, Thompson Hine LLP, Scott A. King, American Servicing Company and Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00778
Filed: July 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Susan J. Dlott
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING 61 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Defendants' motions to dismiss (Docs. 35, 37) are GRANTED. All additional pending motions (Docs. 49, 51, 54, 55, 58, 59, 67, 68) are DENIED AS MOOT. This case shall be CLOSED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/16/17. (sct) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendants' 35 & 37 MOTIONS to Dismiss be Granted; the pending discovery motions 54 55 58 & 59 be Denied as Moot; and this case be Closed on the docket of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 5/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 5/17/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying plaintiffs' 41 & 42 Motions to Strike defendants' motions to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/9/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting defendants LSR and McKelvey's 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the amended complaint. The Motions to Dismiss 13 and 16 are Denied as Moot. Plaintiff's motions for an extension of time to file respo nses 31 and to strike 33 those motions to dismiss are Denied as Moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/2/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified to correct docket text on 2/2/2017 (art).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. US Bank National Association, as Trustee for CSMC Mortgage Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-2 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derryn Nicole Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Earl Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association, as Trustee for CSMC Mortgage Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lerner Sampson & Rothfuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew I. McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson Hine LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott A. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Servicing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?