Crase v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Noah J. Crase
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00882
Filed: August 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: WARREN
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 21 Report and Recommendation granting 20 Joint Stipulation. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 12/4/17. (ba)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the parties 20 joint stipulation for an award of attorney fees and costs be Granted and plaintiff be awarded a total of $2,681.25 in attorney fees and costs under the EAJA. Objections to R&R due by 11/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/7/2017. (art)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 17 Report and Recommendation; the decision of the Commissioner be REVERSED and this case be REMANDED for an award of benefits pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/21/17. (ba)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crase v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah J. Crase
Represented By: Lisa S Hollifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Shefali Baltz
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?