Dearing v. Denny et al
Plaintiff: Marvin Dearing
Defendant: Fred Denny, Larry Green and Walter Sammons
Case Number: 1:2016cv00970
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: SCIOTO
Presiding Judge: Susan J. Dlott
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ADOPTING 39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Accordingly, plaintiffs motion for summary judgment (Doc. 18) is DENIED. Defendants motion for summary judgment (Doc. 28) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs motion to file a supplemental complaint (Doc. 26) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 3/2/2018. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment be Denied; and defendants' 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment be Granted; and that plaintiff's 26 MOTION to file a supplemental complaint be Denied. Objections to R&R due by 12/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/4/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying defendants' 11 Motion to Vacate 5 the October 20, 2016 order granting plaintiff's in forma pauperis application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/6/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING 5 and 7 REPORTS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 11/30/16. Except for plaintiff's claim under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 against the defendants for their participation in disciplinary sanctions allegedly impo sed in violation of, or in retaliation for plaintiff's exercise of, his First Amendment rights, the complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief is granted. Regarding the 7 Report and Recommendation filed on October 2 1, 2016, the plaintiff's 4 motion to show cause for preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order is DENIED. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 4 MOTION to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order be Denied. Objections to R&R due by 11/7/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 10/21/2016. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dearing v. Denny et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Dearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Sammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?