Collins v. Warden Ohio Rehabilitation Correctional Center
Petitioner: |
Joshua E. Collins |
Respondent: |
Warden Ohio Rehabilitation Correctional Center |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00048 |
Filed: |
January 18, 2017 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Cincinnati Office |
County: |
SCIOTO |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephanie K. Bowman |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan J. Dlott |
Nature of Suit: |
General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 7, 2025 |
Filing
43
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 42 Report and Recommendations. Petitioner's 37 Motion to Reopen Case filed by Joshua E. Collins is DENIED without prejudice, and this action will remain stayed and terminated on the Courts ac tive docket pending petitioners compliance with the conditions of the March 12, 2018 stay order. A certificate of appealability will not issue with respect to petitioners motion toreinstate this habeas corpus action (Doc. 37) because under the first prong of the applicable two-part standard enunciated in Slack v. McDaniel, 529 U.S. 473, 48485 (2000), jurists of reasonwould not find it debatable whether this Court is correct in its procedural ruling. With respect to any application by petitione r to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, the request is DENIED. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), the Court certifies that an appeal of this Order would not be taken in good faith. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a); Kincade v. Sparkman, 117 F.3d 949, 952 (6th Cir. 1997).. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 3/7/2025. (wam)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
February 5, 2025 |
Filing
42
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT: (1) Petitioner's motions to reinstate this habeas corpus action (Doc. 37 ) be DENIED without prejudice and that this action remain stayed and terminated on the Court's active docket pen ding petitioner's compliance with the conditions of the 3/12/2018 stay order; (2) A certificate of appealability should not issue; and (3) With respect to any application by petitioner to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, the Court should cer tify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that an appeal of any Order adopting the Report and Recommendation would not be taken in "good faith," and therefore DENY petitioner leave to appeal in forma pauperis upon a showing of financial necessity. Objections to R&R due by 2/19/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 2/5/2025. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
March 28, 2019 |
Filing
30
ORDER adopting 28 Report and Recommendations: Accordingly, petitioner's motions to reinstate this habeas corpus action (Docs. 20, 21) areDENIED without prejudice and that this action remain stayed and terminated on the Court'sactive docket pending petitioner's compliance with the conditions of the March 12, 2018 stayorder. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 3/28/2019. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
March 12, 2018 |
Filing
17
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 9 Motion to Dismiss filed by Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution. Accordingly 9 motion to dismiss is granted to the extent that the amended petition (doc. 5) is administratively stayed an d terminated. Petitioner is granted leave to reinstate the case on the Court's active docket when he has exhausted his Ohio remedies. A certificate of appealability will not issue. The court certifies that an appeal of any order adopting the RR will not be taken in good faith therefore petitioner is denied leave to appeal IFP. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 3/12/18. (wam)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
March 9, 2018 |
Filing
16
ORDER ADOPTING 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS : Petitioner's motion to expand the record is DENIED without prejudice subject to refilling if and when appropriate. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 3/9/2018. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?