Collett v. Hamilton County Ohio/Hamilton County Board of Commissioners et al
Plaintiff: Terry Collett
Defendant: Hamilton County, Ohio, Joanne Taylor, Patrick McKown, Hamilton County Special Deputy Sheriffs, Inc, and The Hamilton County Board of Commissioners
Case Number: 1:2017cv00295
Filed: May 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER that defendants' 61 Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted on (1) plaintiff's 1983 claim against defendant Special Deputy Joanne Taylor; (2) plaintiff's 1983 claims against the Hamilton County, Ohio Board of County Commissione rs and Hamilton County, Ohio and the Hamilton County Special Deputy Sheriffs, Inc., and (3) plaintiff's 1983 claim for excessively forceful handcuffing against defendant Special Deputy Patrick McKown. Defendants' 61 MOTION for Summary J udgment is Denied as to plaintiff's 1983 claim for reckless driving against defendant McKown; and (2) plaintiff's state law negligence claims against defendants Taylor and McKown and against defendant Hamilton County, Ohio under a theory of vicarious liability. Defendant Hamilton County Special Deputy Sheriffs, Inc. is Dismissed from the lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/7/2019. (art)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTATION ORDER granting defendants' 51 Motion to File exhibit under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 10/23/2018. (art)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTATION ORDER granting defendants' 46 Motion for leave to file exhibits under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 10/17/2018. (art)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/7/2017. (art)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collett v. Hamilton County Ohio/Hamilton County Board of Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Collett
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Branch
Represented By: Adam Gingold Gerhardstein
Represented By: Alphonse Adam Gerhardstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Taylor
Represented By: Jerome A Kunkel
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Represented By: Jay R. Wampler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick McKown
Represented By: Jerome A Kunkel
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Represented By: Jay R. Wampler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County Special Deputy Sheriffs, Inc,
Represented By: Jerome A Kunkel
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Represented By: Jay R. Wampler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hamilton County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Jerome A Kunkel
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Represented By: Jay R. Wampler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?