Wogenstahl v. Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Jeffrey A Wogenstahl
Respondent: Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Case Number: 1:2017cv00298
Filed: May 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Merz
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Rose
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER TO FILE RECORD - According to the docket, that filing has not yet occurred. Respondents counsel is directed to complete that filing not later than February 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 1/24/2019. (srb)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING STATE COURT LITIGATION - All proceedings herein are STAYED pending the exhaustion of Wogenstahl's successive post-conviction action in the Ohio courts (including appeal to the First District and the Supreme Co urt of Ohio). The parties shall file a joint status report on that litigation not later than November 1, 2018, and every ninety days thereafter or when the litigation is completed. In order to ensure that the record needed for this litigation remai ns available, Respondent's counsel shall file in this case, in the electronic format being used for state court records in all habeas cases in this Court, the state court record that was before the Court in the prior habeas case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 9/13/2018. (kpf)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DECISION AND ENTRY OVERRULING PETITIONER'S OBJECTIONS [9,23,29]) TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, 22 , ADOPTING TRANSFER ORDER, 6 , AND TERMINATING THE INSTANT CASE. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 3-27-2018. (de)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT - Wogenstahl's Objections are unpersuasive. The Court should overruled them and transfer this case to the Sixth Circuit for a determination under 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b) of whether or not it can proceed. Objections to R&R due by 8/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 8/8/2017. (kpf)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT - Because Wogenstahl's current Petition is a second-or- successive habeas application, he cannot proceed in this Court without permission from the circuit court. It is therefore respectfully recommended that the District Judge affirm the Transfer Order. Objections to Report due by 8/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 7/19/2017. (kpf)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TRANSFER ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that this case be transferred to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals for that court's determination of whether the case may proceed. The effective date of this Order is STAYED until the time for appeal to District Judge Rose has expired or until he has decided the appeal, whichever is later. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 5/4/2017. (kpf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wogenstahl v. Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey A Wogenstahl
Represented By: Andrew P. Avellano
Represented By: Kimberly S Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Represented By: Brenda Stacie Leikala
Represented By: Charles L Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?