Dearing v. Weaks et al
Plaintiff: Marvin Dearing
Defendant: Weaks, Madarsi and Timothy Howard
Case Number: 1:2017cv00425
Filed: June 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: SCIOTO
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K. Bowman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Plaintiffs Objection (Doc. 22) is OVERRULED; Defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. 12) is GRANTED; andthe Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly, whereupon this case is TERMINATED on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/19/2018. (ss)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 12 be GRANTED and this matter be CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 7/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 7/16/2018. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Plaintiff's due process claims against all defendants are DISMISSED. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief 2 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 12/15/17. (gs) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 7/24/17. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. Plaintiff's due process claims against all defendants be DISMISSED. 2. Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunct ion or temporary restraining order (Doc. 2 ) be DENIED. IT IS ORDERED THAT: The United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint, summons, the separate Order issued this date granting the plaintiff in forma pauperis status, and this Order and Report and Recommendation upon defendants, as directed by plaintiff.(Objections to R&R due by 8/7/2017). (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified on 7/24/2017 (eh).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dearing v. Weaks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Dearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madarsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?