Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. R&L Carriers Shared Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: R&L Carriers Shared Services, LLC and R&L Carriers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00515
Filed: August 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: CLINTON
Presiding Judge: Susan J. Dlott
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER following Informal 73 Discovery Conference held on 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/13/2019. (art)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER related to pending discovery matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/20/2019. (art)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting EEOC's 51 Motion to Stay the litigation deadlines in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/26/2018. (art)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/18/2018. (art)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER following 46 Informal Discovery Conference. The EEOC shall submit the (12) documents to the Court for its in camera review by 1/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/11/2018. (art)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER following 39 Informal Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 9/18/2018. (art)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying as moot 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The EEOC is ORDERED to file an amended complaint within fourteen days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply may result in the dismissal of this action. The Court will not grant the EEOC leave to cure any deficiencies in the amended complaint.. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 10/18/17. (wam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. R&L Carriers Shared Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&L Carriers Shared Services, LLC
Represented By: Megan S. Glowacki
Represented By: Keith P Spiller
Represented By: Anthony C White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&L Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: Megan S. Glowacki
Represented By: Keith P Spiller
Represented By: Anthony C White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Kenneth L Bird
Represented By: Kenneth W Brown
Represented By: Jonathan Paul Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?