Cook v. Woodard et al
Plaintiff: Johnnie D. Cook
Defendant: Ryan Woodard, William Cool and Roger Weaks
Case Number: 1:2017cv00532
Filed: August 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: SCIOTO
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K. Bowman
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 35 Defendant Ryan Woodard's Motion for Summary Judgment, 37 Defendant William Cool's Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT: (1) Defendant Woodard's motion for summary judgment 35 shou ld be GRANTED, with all claims to be dismissed against that Defendant; (2) Defendant Cool's motion for summary judgment 37 should be GRANTED IN PART as to Plaintiff's limited claim that Defendant engaged in retaliatory conduct shortly bef ore or during the RIB hearing, but shall be DENIED concerning Plaintiff's claim that Defendant charged him with a conduct report in retaliation for his exercise of his First Amendment rights; (3) If this Report and Recommendation is adopted, th e presiding district judge should set this case for trial. Objections to R&R due by 6/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/4/2019. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Doc. 15 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/1/18. (jlm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 11/30/2017. Plaintiffs 6 Motion to Amend/Correct is hereby GRANTED. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. The complaint, as amended, be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A(b)(1), with the exception of the following claims, which may proceed: Eighth Amendment claim of excessive force against defendant Ryan Woodard, as stated in the original complaint and plaintiffs retal iation claim against defendant Cool, as stated in the amended complaint 2. Defendants 11 moion to dismiss the amended complaint as to defendant Woodard be DENIED. IT IS ORDERED THAT: The United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the original an d amended/corrected complaints (Doc. 3, 10), summons, the Order granting plaintiff in forma pauperis status, and this Order and Report and Recommendation upon defendants Woodard and Cool as directed by plaintiff, with costs of service to be advanced by the United States. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Woodard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Weaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?