FS Management Company v. Union Township Clermont County CIC, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: FS Management Company
Defendant: Union Township Clermont County CIC, Inc., Village Shops, LLC, Salvation Army, RNS Properties Il., LLC, Inland Eastgate Crossing, LLC, OKI Furniture Fair, Inc., Prospect Realty ES, LLC, 32 East, LLC, Walmart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Real Estate Trust and Rosemary Weber
Case Number: 1:2017cv00549
Filed: August 18, 2017
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Referring Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2018 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 39 Report and Recommendation granting and denying as moot 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting and denying as moot 30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting and denying as moot 34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 12 Motion to Dismiss; granting 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/19/18. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 22, 2018 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 43 Report and Recommendation granting 40 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Union township is dismissed as a party. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/21/18. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 1, 2018 43 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendant Union Township's 40 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings be Granted and defendant Union Township be Dismissed as a party from this case. Objections to R&R due by 3/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/1/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FS Management Company v. Union Township Clermont County CIC, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FS Management Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Township Clermont County CIC, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Edward Barbiere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village Shops, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvation Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RNS Properties Il., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inland Eastgate Crossing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKI Furniture Fair, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prospect Realty ES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 32 East, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Real Estate Business Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Real Estate Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?