Rucker v. Hardy et al

Plaintiff: Clifford I. Rucker
Defendant: Hardy, The Kroger Company and Tom Holman
Case Number: 1:2017cv00823
Filed: December 6, 2017
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Referring Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2018 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 30 Report and Recommendations, granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss, granting in part 16 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/22/18. (jlm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 20, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendants Holman and Kroger's 9 MOTION to Dismiss be Granted as to plaintiff's claims brought against these defendants under 42 USC 1983 and Denied as to plaintiff's claims brought against defendant s Holman and Kroger under 42 USC 2000a and ORC 4112.02(G; and that plaintiff's 16 MOTION for leave to amend the complaint be Granted in part and plaintiff be granted leave to amend his claims under 42 USCa and ORC 4112.05(B)(1) to clarify w hether he has exhausted his administrative remedies. Objections to R&R due by 8/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 7/20/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 14, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 20 plaintiff's Motion for Kroger Limited Parternship I/Kroger Company to provide him with copies of video surveillance footage. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 5/14/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rucker v. Hardy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford I. Rucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?