National Logistics Service, Inc. v. Westcoast Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: National Logistics Service, Inc. and National Logistics Service, LLC
Defendant: Westcoast Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00573
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CALENDAR ORDER: Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 3/15/2019. Defendant Primary Expert due by 4/15/2019. Discovery deadline set for 6/14/2019. Parties to exchange witness list and summary due by 5/14/2019. Dispositive Motion deadline set for 8/14/2019. Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 10/8/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 02:00 PM in Chambers Room 716 before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Jury Instructions Submission due by 11/12/2019. Jury Trial set for 11/28/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 708 - Cincinnati before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 9/27/2018. (art)
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 Minute Entry: Case called this date before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz for a Scheduling Conference held via telephone on 9/27/2018. Counsel for plaintiff and defendant present. Case calendar established. Order of the Court to follow. A follow-up status conference has been set for Tues., 11/27/2018 at 3:00 pm via telephone before MJ Litkovitz. (Court Reporter: None present) (art)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 9/11/2018. (jlw)
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Defendant Westcoast Transportation, Inc. Joint Discovery Plan (Brown, Matthew)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Parties Rule 26f Meeting Report due to be filed with the Court by 9/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/17/2018. (art)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 8/17/2018. (jlw)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Westcoast Transportation, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Westcoast Transportation, Inc., filed by National Logistics Service, LLC. Filed in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas on 7/9/2018 as case number A1803366 (jlw)
August 15, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Westcoast Transportation, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, case number A 1803366 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6557778), filed by Westcoast Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Supplemental Cover Sheet) (Brown, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Logistics Service, Inc. v. Westcoast Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westcoast Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Steven Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Logistics Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Logistics Service, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Dempsey Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?