Relo Franchise Services, Inc. v. Gilman et al
Plaintiff: Relo Franchise Services, Inc.
Defendant: Incline Holdings, Inc., Connor Gilman, Charlene Gilman and Pivotal Project Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00578
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER conditionally granting #27 Motion to Strike Exhibit K to Defendants' sealed response in opposition to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. Exhibit K to Defendants' sealed response (Doc. 21-11) shall be STRICKEN from the record on or about 10/12/18 if no objections to this Order are filed or if Defendants timely object to this Order, at such time as the presiding district judge shall order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/5/18. (sct)
October 5, 2018 Filing 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: It is Recommended that Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction should be GRANTED by this Court. Objections to R&R due by 10/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/5/18. (sct)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #32 Defendants' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Until 10/15/2018 to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint #6 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/26/2018. (km)
September 25, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Complaint, New date requested 10/15/2018. by Defendants Charlene Gilman, Connor Gilman, Incline Holdings, Inc., Pivotal Project Management, Inc.. (Lanphear, Nicholas)
September 19, 2018 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Motion Hearing (DAY 2) held on 9/19/2018 re #7 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Continued testimony and evidence presented to the Court. Closing arguments heard. Matter taken under advisement. The Court will issue a written order in the near future. The entire transcript of these proceedings shall be filed UNDER SEAL. (Court Reporter: Connie Sumner (Mike Mobley Reporting)) (km) Modified Docket Text to Clarify on 9/19/2018 (km).
September 14, 2018 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Strike Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Relo Franchise Services, Inc.. (Curran, Matthew)
September 14, 2018 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Hearing held on 9/14/2018 re #7 Plaintiff's for Preliminary Injunction. Counsel and parties present. Testimony and evidence presented to the Court. Defendants moves the Court for dissolution of the current agreed TRO and that Plaintiff be required to post bond for a TRO. Motion denied by the Court at this time. Matter continued to 9/18/2018 at 10:30 PM. The Court orders that the entire transcript of these proceedings shall be filed UNDER SEAL. (Court Reporter: Luke Lavin (Official)) (Attachments: #1 Seating Chart) (km)
September 13, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Strike filed by Defendants Charlene Gilman, Connor Gilman, Incline Holdings, Inc., Pivotal Project Management, Inc.. (Lanphear, Nicholas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Strike by Plaintiff Relo Franchise Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Strike) (Curran, Matthew)
September 12, 2018 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Relo Franchise Services, Inc.. (Curran, Matthew)
September 11, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION of Connor Gilman by Plaintiff Relo Franchise Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16) (Curran, Matthew)
September 11, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION of Charlene Gilman by Plaintiff Relo Franchise Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Curran, Matthew)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #19 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to File Certain Material Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/6/2018. (km)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #20 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Until 9/10/2018 to File Response re #7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/6/2018. (km)
September 5, 2018 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction New date requested 9/10/2018. by Defendants Charlene Gilman, Connor Gilman, Incline Holdings, Inc., Pivotal Project Management, Inc.. (Lanphear, Nicholas)
September 5, 2018 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to File Document Under Seal for Leave to File Certain Materials Under Seal by Plaintiff Relo Franchise Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Alex Taylor in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Leave for the Parties to File Certain Materials Under Seal) (Curran, Matthew)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 8/31/2018. (km)
August 30, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by Plaintiff Relo Franchise Services, Inc. of Deposition of Defendant Connor Gilman (Curran, Matthew)
August 30, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE by Plaintiff Relo Franchise Services, Inc. of Deposition of Defendant Charlene Gilman (Curran, Matthew)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #15 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Until 10/1/2018 to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 8/29/2018. (km)
August 29, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 10/1/2018. by Defendants Charlene Gilman, Connor Gilman, Incline Holdings, Inc., Pivotal Project Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lanphear, Nicholas)
August 29, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Alex Taylor by Defendants Charlene Gilman, Connor Gilman, Incline Holdings, Inc., Pivotal Project Management, Inc.. (Lanphear, Nicholas)
August 29, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Timothy Haines by Defendants Charlene Gilman, Connor Gilman, Incline Holdings, Inc., Pivotal Project Management, Inc.. (Lanphear, Nicholas)
August 20, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants' Response due by 9/7/2018. Plaintiff's Reply due by 9/12/2018 at Noon. (km)
August 20, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Telephone Conference re: discovery to take place prior to the Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 8/20/2018. Attorney Matthew Curran appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorney Nicholas Lanphear appeared on behalf of Defendants. Parties to exchange written discovery requests by 8/24/2018. Responses to written discovery due 8/31/2018. Follow-up telephone conference set for 8/28/2018 at 2:00 PM to discuss any objections, if any. Each side is permitted to a total of 8 hours of deposition time, with no one deposition exceeding 4 hours. Depositions to be scheduled for 9/4/2018 and 9/5/2018, if possible. Defendants' response to the motion for preliminary injunction is due 9/7/2018. Plaintiff's reply brief due by noon on 9/12/2018. Parties may submit a joint motion for protective order. (km)
August 17, 2018 Filing 11 AGREED INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 8/17/18. (wam)
August 16, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/13/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 701 before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. *NOTE: Counsel shall contact Kevin Moser, Courtroom Deputy to Magistrate Judge Bowman, no later than 9/6/2018, if it is determined that the parties will require courtroom technology to assist them in presenting arguments to the Court. (km)
August 16, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Conference prior to hearing on #7 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction held on 8/16/2018. Attorney Matthew Curran appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorney Nicholas Lanphear appeared on behalf of Defendants. Counsel advises the Court that the parties have come to an agreement in principle on language for a proposed temporary restraining order. The parties further request that the Court permit them time to reduce the agreement to writing so that a proposed order could be submitted to the Court. This would eliminate the need for a formal hearing on the temporary restraining order. The Court granted counsel's request. A proposed agreed entry was subsequently submitted to the Court for review and signature of Judge Dlott and the hearing was vacated. (km) Modified Docket Text on 8/16/2018 (km).
August 15, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 701 before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. The Court shall hear arguments only as to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order at this hearing. (km)
August 15, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas on 8/10/2018, Case Number A1804373, by Plaintiff Relo Franchise Services, Inc. (km)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas on 8/9/2018, Case Number A1804373, against Charlene Gilman, Connor Gilman, Incline Holdings, Inc., Pivotal Project Management, Inc., by Plaintiff Relo Franchise Services, Inc. (km)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 8/15/2018. (jlw)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Defendants Charlene Gilman, Connor Gilman, Incline Holdings, Inc., Pivotal Project Management, Inc. re #2 MOTION to File Document Under Seal Notice of Withdrawal of Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal (Lanphear, Nicholas)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Defendants Charlene Gilman, Connor Gilman, Incline Holdings, Inc., Pivotal Project Management, Inc. Amended Notice of Removal (Lanphear, Nicholas)
August 15, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Defendants Charlene Gilman, Connor Gilman, Incline Holdings, Inc., Pivotal Project Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lanphear, Nicholas)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from HAMILTON COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number A1804373 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6558547), filed by Incline Holdings, Inc., Charlene Gilman, Connor Gilman, Pivotal Project Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Lanphear, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Relo Franchise Services, Inc. v. Gilman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Incline Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas William Lanphear
Represented By: James Joseph Hughes, III
Represented By: Jeffrey P McSherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connor Gilman
Represented By: Nicholas William Lanphear
Represented By: James Joseph Hughes, III
Represented By: Jeffrey P McSherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene Gilman
Represented By: Nicholas William Lanphear
Represented By: James Joseph Hughes, III
Represented By: Jeffrey P McSherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pivotal Project Management, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas William Lanphear
Represented By: James Joseph Hughes, III
Represented By: Jeffrey P McSherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Relo Franchise Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew C Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?