Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Lynch et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Charlotte Lynch and Dewey Allen Lynch
Case Number: 1:2018cv00627
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Charlotte Lynch, Dewey Allen Lynch. Charlotte Lynch served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018; Dewey Allen Lynch served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (jlw)
October 25, 2018 Filing 13 Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (bjc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 12 *DISREGARD THIS ENTRY, IT WAS FILED IN ERROR* Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kaia Khamisi re 96 Order was returned marked released. (jlw) Modified to restrict entries to court users only on 10/26/2018 (jlw).
October 24, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Charlotte Lynch, Dewey Allen Lynch. (jlw)
October 19, 2018 Filing 10 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Charlotte Lynch, Dewey Allen Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Alias Summons) (mr)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Alias on Charlotte Lynch (Koberg, Jeffrey)
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Alias on Dewey Lynch (Koberg, Jeffrey)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE re #6 Certificate of Clerk Clerk received unsigned certified mail card back in mail. As of 10/11/20158 USPS tracking still has the Rule 4.2 service status as in transit. (jlw)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (bjc)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Charlotte Lynch, Dewey Allen Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (sct)
September 10, 2018 ***If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (sct)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. On Charlotte Lynch (Koberg, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. on Dewey Allen Lynch (Koberg, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Koberg, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6590251), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Koberg, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Lynch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewey Allen Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey L Koberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?