London Computer Systems, Inc. v. Zillow, Inc.
Plaintiff: London Computer Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Zillow, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00696
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Notation Order: In light of the parties' agreement that an evidentiary hearing is unnecessary, and the Court's determination that Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction can be resolved pursuant to the parties' pleadings, the hearing scheduled for 11/28/18 is VACATED. Plaintiff shall file a reply brief by 12/3/18. Defendant may file a sur-reply, if desired, by 12/7/18. IT IS SO ORDERED signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/27/18. (eh)
November 26, 2018 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Exclude The Expert Report and Testimony of Rebecca Walker Reczek filed by Plaintiff London Computer Systems, Inc.. (Sayre, Russell)
November 20, 2018 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Jeffery A. Stec, PhD in Support of Zillow's Opposition to London Computer Systems, Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Counter Claimant Zillow, Inc., Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Rava, William)
November 16, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION to Exclude The Expert Report and Testimony of Rebecca Walker Reczek by Counter Claimant Zillow, Inc., Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Reczek Report, #2 Exhibit B, Placeholder for Exhibit Filed Under Seal) (Hankinson, Thomas)
November 16, 2018 Filing 33 ANSWER to #17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses filed by London Computer Systems, Inc.. (Sayre, Russell)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL (Docs. 21, 24) - Plaintiffs motion to file under seal (Doc. #21 ) and Defendants motion to file under seal (Doc. #24 ) are CONDITIONALLY GRANTED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/13/2018. (bjc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 25 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Plead to Defendant Zillow, Inc.'s Counterclaim by Plaintiff London Computer Systems, Inc.. (Bryan, Beth)
November 12, 2018 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Counter Claimant Zillow, Inc., Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hankinson, Thomas)
November 12, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to File Document Under Seal , #21 Supplemental MOTION to File Document Under Seal Consenting to Plaintiff's Motions For Leave To Seal filed by Counter Claimant Zillow, Inc., Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Hankinson, Thomas)
November 9, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Scott for Defendant Zillow, Inc. (Scott, Stephanie)
November 8, 2018 Filing 21 Supplemental MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiff London Computer Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bryan, Beth)
November 8, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiff London Computer Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bryan, Beth)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/1/18. (sct)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Notation Order: The parties' joint motion for protective order (Doc. 18) is GRANTED. The Court will enter the parties' proposed order forthwith. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black. (sct)
October 26, 2018 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff London Computer Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order) (Bryan, Beth)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Notation Order: At the parties' request, the briefing schedule set forth in the 10/4/18 Notation Order is adjusted as follows: Plaintiff's renewed memorandum in support of its motion for preliminary injunction is due 11/13/18; Defendant's response in opposition to the renewed memorandum is due 11/20/18. All other dates remain. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black. (sct)
October 24, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against London Computer Systems, Inc. filed by Zillow, Inc.. (Hankinson, Thomas)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy Buxbaum. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 10/23/18. (eh)
October 17, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6641763) of Jeremy L. Buxbaum by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 IL Certificate of Good Standing) (Hankinson, Thomas)
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, TRO motion, memorandum in support, proposed order, declaration of David Hegemann, and certificate of attorney compliance served on Zillow, Inc. c/o CT Corporation System, Olympia, WA on 10/03/2018, filed by Plaintiff London Computer Systems, Inc.. (Sayre, Russell)
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, TRO motion, memorandum in support, proposed order, declaration of David Hegemann, and certificate of attorney compliance served on Zillow, Inc. on 10/03/2018, filed by Plaintiff London Computer Systems, Inc.. (Sayre, Russell)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William C. Rava. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 10/16/2018. (eh)
October 15, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of William C. Rava, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 23) (Hankinson, Thomas)
October 12, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Zillow, Inc. answer due 10/24/2018. (jlw)
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by Defendant Zillow, Inc. re #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6633743) of William C. Rava Certificate of Good Standing (Hankinson, Thomas)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6633743) of William C. Rava by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Hankinson, Thomas)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Zillow, Inc.. Zillow, Inc. served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018 (Sayre, Russell) Modified to clarify docket text and set answer date on 10/12/2018 (jlw).
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Zillow, Inc.. (Hankinson, Thomas)
October 4, 2018 Minute Entry, Notice of Hearing, and Notation Order: This civil action came before the Court on 10/4/18 at 1:30 p.m. for an informal conference by telephone pursuant to S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 65.1 regarding Plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. Beth Bryan, Russell Sayre, and Leon Bass participated on behalf of Plaintiff; Tom Hankinson, William Rava, and Jeremy Buxbaum participated on behalf of Defendant. This civil action is hereby set for a hearing on Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction on November 28, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Cincinnati, Courtroom #1, Room 805. Defendant will file a brief in opposition to Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (Doc 2) on or before 10/15/18; Plaintiff will file a renewed memorandum in support of the motion for preliminary injunction on or before 11/12/18; Defendant will file a response in opposition to the renewed memorandum on or before 11/19/18. IT IS SO ORDERED. (sct)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Frost Hankinson for Defendant Zillow, Inc. (Hankinson, Thomas)
October 2, 2018 Notation Order and Notice of Hearing: Pursuant to Local Rule 65.1, the Court sets this case for an informal preliminary conference by telephone on 10/4/18 at 1:30 p.m. for the purpose of discussing Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. Plaintiff shall provide notice of this conference to counsel for Defendant. COUNSEL SHALL CALL: 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. (ss)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff London Computer Systems, Inc.. (Sayre, Russell)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Zillow, Inc.. (bjc)
October 2, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ( Responses due by 10/22/2018) by Plaintiff London Computer Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of David L. Hegemann, Part I, #3 Declaration of David L. Hegemann, Part II, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Attorney Compliance) (Sayre, Russell)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Zillow, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6621732), filed by London Computer Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-K, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form Summons to Zillow, #4 Summons Form Summons to Zillow c/o Ohio registered agent, #5 Summons Form Summons to Zillow c/o Washington registered agent) (Sayre, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: London Computer Systems, Inc. v. Zillow, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zillow, Inc.
Represented By: William C. Rava
Represented By: Thomas Frost Hankinson
Represented By: Stephanie Scott
Represented By: Jeremy L. Buxbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: London Computer Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Russell S Sayre
Represented By: Leon David Bass
Represented By: Beth A. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?