Gilliam v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company

Plaintiff: Charles Gilliam
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00700
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE: Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 1/2/2019. The Court will thereafter, pursuant to Rule 16(b), enter a Calendar Order or will set and hold a Scheduling Conference after which a Calendar Order will be issued. (km)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Brockman, James)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Norfolk Southern Railway Company on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Thompson, Robert)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 10/4/18. (ba)
October 4, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Norfolk Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6626301), filed by Charles Gilliam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thompson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilliam v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: James Foley Brockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Gilliam
Represented By: Robert Bruce Thompson
Represented By: Robert E. Harrington, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?