Clausing v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company

Plaintiff: Joshua Clausing
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00703
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/20/2018. Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms; (ba)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Brockman, James)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Norfolk Southern Railway Company on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Thompson, Robert)
October 4, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Norfolk Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6626932), filed by Joshua Clausing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thompson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clausing v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Clausing
Represented By: Robert Bruce Thompson
Represented By: Robert E. Harrington, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: James Foley Brockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?