In re: Franklin D Harris, Jr et al

Appellee: Daniel Cooley and Kaylay Cooley
Appellant: Franklin D Harris, Jr and Gwendolyn G Harris
Case Number: 1:2018cv00712
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Referring Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 Appellant's BRIEF by Appellants Franklin D Harris, Jr, Gwendolyn G Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope) (bjc)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Certification of Record on Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 11/23/2018. Appellee Brief due by 12/7/2018. Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Doc 1- Complaint, #2 Doc 2- Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet, #3 Doc 3- Summons Issued - D Cooley, #4 Doc 4- Summons Issued - K Cooley, #5 Doc 5- Report to Court of Chapter 13 Trustee, #6 Doc 6- Summons(es) on D Cooley 9-11-17, #7 Doc 7- Summons(es) on K Cooley 9-11-17, #8 Doc 8- Request for Entry of Default of D Cooley, #9 Doc 9- Request for Entry of Default of K Cooley, #10 Doc 10- Order Denying, #11 Doc 11- BNC Certificate of Mailing, #12 Doc 12- Response, #13 Doc 13- Debtors Motion for entry Default Judgment, #14 Doc 14- Debtors Joint Sworn Declaration, #15 Doc 15- Exhibits 1-10, #16 Doc 15- Exhibits 11-20, #17 Doc 15- Exhibits 21-32, #18 Doc 16- Proposed Court Order, #19 Doc 18- Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding, #20 Doc 1- Voluntary Petition, #21 Doc 6- Chapter 13 Plan, #22 Doc 16- First Amended 13 Plan, #23 Doc 21- Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan, #24 Doc 43- Motion for Contempt) (er)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Appellants Franklin D Harris, Jr, Gwendolyn G Harris of multiple filings of notice of appeal. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Notice of Appeal, #3 Proceed Pro Se Informa Pauperis on Appeal, #4 Objections, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3) (ss)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The parties briefing schedule will be established once the District Court receives the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Certification of Record on Appeal. Bankruptcy Court case number 15-12647. (Attachments: #1 Order being Appealed, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Appeal Transmittal Cover Sheet) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Franklin D Harris, Jr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Daniel Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kaylay Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Franklin D Harris, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gwendolyn G Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?