Ina Group, LLC. v. Patel et al
Plaintiff: Ina Group, LLC.
Defendant: Taraben N. Patel, Natubhai S. Patel, Denise Harrison, The Yacht Club Community Facilities Association, Inc., The Huntington National Bank, Fifth Third Bank and Hamilton County Treasurer
Case Number: 1:2018cv00733
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER of USCA Accordingly, we are without jurisdiction to review the remand order and DISMISS this appeal as to #12 Notice of Appeal filed by Denise Harrison Note: No Mandate to issue. (pb)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re #15 Report and Recommendation denying #13 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 11/27/19. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #13 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Defendant Denise Harrison. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT Defendant Denise Harrison's motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis be DENIED. Pursuant to FRAP 24(a)(4), Defendant may file, within 30 days after service of the District Court's Order adopting this Report and Recommendation, a motion with the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals for leave to proceed as a pauper on appeal. Defendant's motion must include a copy of the affidavit filed in the District Court and this Court's statement as to the reasons for denying pauper status on appeal. Defendant is notified that if she does not file a motion within 30 days of receiving notice of the District Court's decision as required by FRAP 24(a)(5) or fails to pay the required filing fee of $455.00 within this same time period, the appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution. Once dismissed for want of prosecution, the appeal will not be reinstated, even if the filing fee or motion for pauper status is subsequently tendered, unless Defendant can demonstrate that she did not receive notice of the District Court's decision within the time period prescribed for by FRAP 24(a)(5). Objections to R&R due by 11/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/21/2019. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 USCA Case Number 19-3967 for #12 Notice of Appeal; case manager Jill Colyer, 513-564-7024. (er)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Defendant Denise Harrison. (bjc)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #10 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, Order on Report and Recommendations, #11 Clerk's Judgment (FILING FEE DUE) by Defendant Denise Harrison. (bjc)
September 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERK'S JUDGMENT filed concurrently with #10 Order signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/29/19. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #6 Report and Recommendation granting #2 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/29/19. (Copy of this Order is being sent to the Hamilton County, Ohio Court of Common Pleas via regular U.S. mail.) (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Defendant's Motion of Objections (doc. #8 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION) re #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed by Plaintiff Ina Group, LLC.. (Brady, David) Modified on 1/3/2019 (eh).
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #5 Complaint filed by Ina Group, LLC., #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ina Group, LLC. filed by Defendant Denise Harrison. (bjc)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by Defendant Denise Harrison. (bjc)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Defendant Denise Harrison's petition for removal be DENIED; Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #2 be GRANTED and this matter be REMANDED to the Hamilton County, Ohio Court of Common Pleas. It is further RECOMMENDED that the Court should certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) that an appeal of any Order adopting this Report and Recommendation would not be taken in good faith and therefore deny Defendant Denis Harrison leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 12/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 12/3/2018. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, Case No. A1602913 against All Defendants, filed 5/18/2016 by Ina Group, LLC. (km) Modified Docket Text on 12/3/2018 (km). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (km).
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A1602913, filed by Denise Harrison. (km)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 12/3/2018. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Ina Group, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Natubhai S. Patel) (Brady, David)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Defendant Denise Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet and Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Documents) (jlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ina Group, LLC. v. Patel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taraben N. Patel
Represented By: Edwin Louis Hoseus, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natubhai S. Patel
Represented By: Edwin Louis Hoseus, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Yacht Club Community Facilities Association, Inc.
Represented By: Brian William Wais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Huntington National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County Treasurer
Represented By: Lawrence C Baron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ina Group, LLC.
Represented By: David T Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?