Fecon, Inc. v. Denis Cimaf, Inc.

Plaintiff: Fecon, Inc.
Defendant: Denis Cimaf, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00748
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 26, 2018 8 Summons Issued as to Denis Cimaf, Inc.. (jlw)
December 21, 2018 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Bennett, John)
November 16, 2018 6 Featured Case *THIS ENTRY WAS DOCKETED IN ERROR* RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that 1:17-cv-820 and case number 1:18-cv-748 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Michael R. Barrett for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett and Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/16/2018. (jlw) Modified Clerk removed document and will file on correct case on 11/20/2018 (jlw).
November 16, 2018 5 Featured Case RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 1:17-cv-820 are NOT related. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett and Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/16/2018. (jlw) Modified to add judge information on 11/19/2018 (sct).
October 31, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc)
October 30, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Fecon, Inc.. (Bennett, John)
October 30, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Denis Cimaf, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6660793), filed by Fecon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. D795,931, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bennett, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fecon, Inc. v. Denis Cimaf, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fecon, Inc.
Represented By: John Francis Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis Cimaf, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?