Wallace v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company

Plaintiff: Richard Wallace
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00760
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties shall confer no later than January 14, 2019 to consider the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, to make or arrange for the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1), and to develop a proposed discovery plan. Such proposed schedule shall be filed no later than January 21, 2019. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 01/02/2019. (bjc)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Brockman, James)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Norfolk Southern Railway Company on 11/6/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Acker, Laurence)
November 7, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Norfolk Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6669007), filed by Richard Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thompson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Wallace
Represented By: Robert Bruce Thompson
Represented By: Robert E. Harrington, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: James Foley Brockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?