Browning v. Ohio National Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Lance Browning
Defendant: Ohio National Life Insurance Company, Ohio National Life Assurance Company, Ohio National Equities, Inc., Ohio National Financial Services, Inc. and Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv00763
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Filing 38 MANDATE of USCA as to #35 Notice of Appeal: No costs taxed. (er)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER of USCA Accordingly, the judgment of the district court is affirmed as to #35 Notice of Appeal filed by Lance Browning Note: Mandate to issue. (pb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 36 USCA Case Number 19-4082 for #35 Notice of Appeal filed by Lance Browning; case manager Antoinette Macon, 513-564-7015. (er)
October 31, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #33 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Filing fee has been paid, receipt number 0648-7181867) by Plaintiff Lance Browning. (Boyle, Michael)
October 3, 2019 Filing 34 CLERK'S JUDGMENT affirming doc.#33 (wam)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER rejection RR #26 and granting #15 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 10/2/19. (wam)
September 17, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan J. Dlott: Motion Hearing held on 9/17/2019 re #15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings As To First Amended Complaint For Lack Of Standing And/Or Failure To State A Claim filed by Ohio National Equities, Inc., Ohio National Life Insurance Company, Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation, Ohio National Financial Services, Inc. Matter taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Luke Lavin) (wam)
August 30, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings As To First Amended Complaint For Lack Of Standing And/Or Failure To State A Claim filed by Ohio National Equities, Inc., Ohio National Life Insurance Company, Ohio : Motion Hearing reset for 9/17/2019 at 2:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Susan J. Dlott. (wam)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on #26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings As To First Amended Complaint For Lack Of Standing And/Or Failure To State A Claim filed by Ohio National Equities, Inc., Ohio National Life Insurance Company, Ohio : Oral Argument Hearing set for 9/24/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Susan J. Dlott. The Court will also conduct a hearing in Case 1:19cv195 Cook v The Ohio National Life Insurance Company on this date and time (wam)
July 25, 2019 Filing 32 Response re #30 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Lance Browning. (Meyer, David)
July 22, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to #27 First MOTION for Hearing filed by Defendants Ohio National Equities, Inc., Ohio National Financial Services, Inc., Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation, Ohio National Life Insurance Company. (Hogan, Christopher) Modified text on 7/22/2019 - Columbus Clerk's Office received call about this entry (er).
July 12, 2019 Filing 30 OBJECTION to #26 Report and Recommendations by Defendants Ohio National Equities, Inc., Ohio National Financial Services, Inc., Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation, Ohio National Life Insurance Company. (Little, Marion)
July 9, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 First MOTION for Hearing filed by Plaintiff Lance Browning. (Wilson, Matthew)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER - The reference to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman is hereby RESCINDED and all further proceedings shall be conducted by the undersigned. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 7/8/2019. (eh)
July 5, 2019 Filing 27 First MOTION for Hearing by Defendants Ohio National Equities, Inc., Ohio National Financial Services, Inc., Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation, Ohio National Life Insurance Company. (Little, Marion)
June 28, 2019 Filing 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to First Amended Complaint For Lack Of Standing And/Or Failure To State A Claim filed by Defendants Ohio National Equities, Inc., Ohio National Life Insurance Company, Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation and Ohio National Financial Services, Inc. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Defendant Ohio National's motion for judgment on the pleadings #15 be DENIED. However, it is RECOMMENDED ONFS's motion for judgment on the pleadings be GRANTED and Plaintiff's tortious interference claim be dismissed and ONFS be dismissed as a party inthis case. (See p. 1, note 1). It is further RECOMMENDED that this matter be CONSOLIDATED with the related case, Cook v. The Ohio National Life Insurance Company et al., Case No. 1:19-cv-00195. As is the practice of this Court, it is RECOMMENDED that case numbers 1:18-cv-763 and 1:19-cv-00195 be consolidated into case number 1:18-cv-763 since that case was the first filed case. Objections to R&R due by 7/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/28/2019. (km)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CALENDAR ORDER: Discovery deadline set for 180 days after the Court's decision on class certification. Deadline to identify plaintiff experts and provide reports set for 60 days after the Court's decision on class certification. Deadline to identify defendants' experts and provide reports set for 90 days after the Court's decision on class certification. Dispositive motion deadline to be set after other preliminary threshold matters are decided. The Final Pretrial Conference and trial dates will be scheduled by Judge Dlott. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/18/2019. (km)
June 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 6/18/2019. Attorney Matthew Wilson appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorney Marion Little appeared on behalf of Defendants. Calendar Order to follow. (km)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED ORDER OF REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott. (wam)
April 19, 2019 NOTICE of Deadline: REVISED Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 6/10/2019. (km)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott, Judge Michael R. Barrett, and Judge Timothy S. Black. The Judges agree that the cases are related and that all the cases should be transferred to the docket of Judge Susan J. Dlott. (eh)
April 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 4/12/2019. Attorney Matthew Wilson appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorney Marion Little appeared on behalf of Defendants. No Calendar Order to be docketed at this time. Telephone Scheduling Conference continued to 6/18/2019 at 2:00 PM. The pending motion to dismiss #10 is denied as moot. (km)
March 18, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings As To First Amended Complaint For Lack Of Standing And/Or Failure To State A Claim filed by Defendants Ohio National Equities, Inc., Ohio National Financial Services, Inc., Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation, Ohio National Life Insurance Company. (Little, Marion)
March 15, 2019 Filing 19 RULE 26(f) REPORT [Joint] by Plaintiff Lance Browning. (Wilson, Matthew)
March 4, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings As To First Amended Complaint For Lack Of Standing And/Or Failure To State A Claim filed by Plaintiff Lance Browning. (Meyer, David)
February 12, 2019 Filing 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE: Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 3/18/2019. The Court will thereafter, pursuant to Rule 16(b), enter a Calendar Order or will set and hold a Scheduling Conference after which a Calendar Order will be issued. (km)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings As To First Amended Complaint For Lack Of Standing And/Or Failure To State A Claim by Defendants Ohio National Equities, Inc., Ohio National Financial Services, Inc., Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation, Ohio National Life Insurance Company. (Little, Marion)
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, filed by All Defendants. (Little, Marion)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #13 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Until 2/11/2019 to Answer, Move or Plead to #11 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 1/17/2019. (km)
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Amended Complaint, New date requested 2/11/2019. Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move Or Plead in Response to First Amended Complaint by Defendants Ohio National Equities, Inc., Ohio National Financial Services, Inc., Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation, Ohio National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Hogan, Christopher)
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Ohio National Financial Services, Inc.. (bjc)
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against Ohio National Equities, Inc., Ohio National Life Assurance Company, Ohio National Life Insurance Company, Ohio National Financial Services, Inc., filed by Lance Browning. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Exhibit A) (Wilson, Matthew)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Ohio National Equities, Inc., Ohio National Life Assurance Company, Ohio National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 LEXIS Cases) (Little, Marion)
November 26, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Ohio National Equities, Inc. answer due 12/21/2018; Ohio National Life Assurance Company answer due 12/21/2018; Ohio National Life Insurance Company answer due 12/21/2018. (bjc)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Answer Date by Defendants Ohio National Equities, Inc., Ohio National Life Assurance Company, Ohio National Life Insurance Company. (Little, Marion) Modified Docket Text on 11/26/2018 (bjc).
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Ohio National Life Assurance Company. Ohio National Life Assurance Company served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Boyle, Michael)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Ohio National Life Insurance Company. Ohio National Life Insurance Company served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Boyle, Michael)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Ohio National Equities, Inc.. (Little, Marion)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Ohio National Life Assurance Company. (Little, Marion)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Ohio National Life Insurance Company. (Little, Marion)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ohio National Equities, Inc., Ohio National Life Assurance Company, Ohio National Life Insurance Company. (bjc)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (vp)
November 7, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Ohio National Equities, Inc., Ohio National Life Assurance Company, Ohio National Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6669857), filed by Lance Browning. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Ohio National Life Insurance Co., #3 Summons Form Ohio National Life Assurance Co., #4 Summons Form Ohio National Equities, Inc.) (Meyer, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Browning v. Ohio National Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Marion H Little
Represented By: Christopher J Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio National Life Assurance Company
Represented By: Marion H Little
Represented By: Christopher J Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio National Equities, Inc.
Represented By: Marion H Little
Represented By: Christopher J Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio National Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J Hogan
Represented By: Marion H Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation
Represented By: Marion H Little
Represented By: Christopher J Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Browning
Represented By: David P Meyer
Represented By: Matthew R Wilson
Represented By: Michael J Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Dennis J Concilla
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?