Collins v. CSX Transportation, Inc.

Plaintiff: John Collins
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION INC. and CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00808
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/31/2019. by Plaintiff John Collins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Leizerman, Joshua)
December 27, 2018 NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/17/2019. Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms; (ba)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Carnes, James)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc.. CSX Transportation, Inc. served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Leizerman, Joshua)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CSX Transportation, Inc. (eh)
November 20, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against CSX TRANSPORTATION INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6685973), filed by John Collins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Leizerman, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: James R Carnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Collins
Represented By: Joshua M Leizerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?