Burress et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Kim Burress and Bonnie Caudill
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and Synthes USA Products, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00909
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Johnson & Johnson on 12/28/2018, answer due 2/26/2019; Medical Device Business Services, Inc. on 12/28/2018, answer due 2/26/2019. (Bailey, Melanie)
January 29, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Synthes USA Products, LLC answer due 2/26/2019. (eh)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. on 12/28/2018, answer due 2/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Receipt) (Bailey, Melanie)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Synthes USA Products, LLC on 12/28/2018, answer due 2/26/2019. (Bailey, Melanie) Modified to correct sent date and answer deadline on 1/29/2019 (eh). Modified Waiver Sent Date on 1/30/2019 (bjc).
December 31, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Medical Device Business Services, Inc., Synthes USA Products, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6732948), filed by Kim Burress, Bonnie Caudill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Burress, #3 Exhibit B Caudill) (Abaray, Janet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burress et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Device Business Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synthes USA Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Burress
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Caudill
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Represented By: Margaret M Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?