Bennett et al v. Ethicon, Inc.

Plaintiff: Stacy Bennett and Robert Bennett
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00165
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Intra District Transfer - Case transferred to Columbus as case number 2:19-cv-782. This case has been closed and all future filings should be made in case number 2:19-cv-782. (jlw)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The above captioned matter is hereby TRANSFERRED from the docket of The Honorable Susan J. Dlott to the Clerk of this Court for reassignment in the Eastern Division in Columbus. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 3/5/2019. (jlw)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., filed by Robert Bennett, Stacy Bennett. Originally filed in Franklin County Court of Common Please on 2/22/19. (sct)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Ethicon US, LLC, filed by Robert Bennett, Stacy Bennett. Originally filed in Franklin County Court of Common Please on 2/6/19. (sct)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan J. Dlott for all further proceedings. Judge Michael R. Barrett no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/4/19. (ba)(This document has NOT been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified on 3/4/2019 (ba) to edit text and regenerate a NEF.
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Defendant Ethicon, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Civil Cover Sheet (Cox, Brandon)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Ethicon, Inc... (Cox, Brandon)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19CV001113 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6819710), filed by Ethicon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A B and C) (Cox, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett et al v. Ethicon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon D. Cox
Represented By: Rita A Maimbourg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Bennett
Represented By: Megan R. Hayden
Represented By: Terry Van Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bennett
Represented By: Megan R. Hayden
Represented By: Terry Van Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?