Sonet Transportation and Logistics, Inc. v. Bush Truck Leasing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sonet Transportation and Logistics, Inc.
Defendant: Vehicle Titling Trust, Police Officers Does 1-10 and Bush Truck Leasing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00208
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P. Gordon for Plaintiff Sonet Transportation and Logistics, Inc. (Gordon, Christopher)
March 18, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A Yeager for Plaintiff Sonet Transportation and Logistics, Inc. (Yeager, Jeffrey)
March 18, 2019 Judge Timothy S. Black added. (pb)
March 18, 2019 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:18-cv-02203. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 24, 2019 Filing 18 Case transferred to District of Southern District of Ohio. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Southern District of Ohio*.*85 Marconi Blvd Rm 460**Columbus, OH 43215*. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (sjm) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 3/18/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/24/2019. (sjm) [Transferred from California Southern on 3/18/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Cole Myers on behalf of Sonet Transportation and Logistics, Inc. (Myers, Andrew)Attorney Andrew Cole Myers added to party Sonet Transportation and Logistics, Inc.(pty:pla) (sjm). [Transferred from California Southern on 3/18/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of Ohio or, Alternatively, to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Bush Truck Leasing, Inc., Vehicle Titling Trust. (Battin, Michael) (sjm). [Transferred from California Southern on 3/18/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Minute Order by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller: Submitting, #12 MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of Ohio. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2018 9:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller is vacated. Written order to follow. (no document attached) (gac) [Transferred from California Southern on 3/18/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of Ohio or Alternatively, To Dismiss the Complaint filed by Sonet Transportation and Logistics, Inc.. (Angert, Mark) (sjm). [Transferred from California Southern on 3/18/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of Ohio by Bush Truck Leasing, Inc., Vehicle Titling Trust. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Battin, Michael) (sjm). [Transferred from California Southern on 3/18/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 PRO HAC APPROVED re #10 : Jacob D. Rhode appearing for Defendants Bush Truck Leasing, Inc., Vehicle Titling Trust. (no document attached) (mdc) [Transferred from California Southern on 3/18/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11877004.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Rhode, Jacob) (mdc) [Transferred from California Southern on 3/18/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 PRO HAC APPROVED re #8 : Gregory M. Utter appearing for Defendants Bush Truck Leasing, Inc., Vehicle Titling Trust. (no document attached) (mdc) [Transferred from California Southern on 3/18/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11871344.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Utter, Gregory) (mdc) [Transferred from California Southern on 3/18/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Joint Motion to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond To Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 10/10/2018. (sjm) [Transferred from California Southern on 3/18/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to Respond to Complaint by Bush Truck Leasing, Inc., Vehicle Titling Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Battin, Michael)Attorney Michael W. Battin added to party Bush Truck Leasing, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael W. Battin added to party Vehicle Titling Trust(pty:dft) (sjm). [Transferred from California Southern on 3/18/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonet Transportation and Logistics, Inc. Vehicle Titling Trust served. (Angert, Mark) (acc). [Transferred from California Southern on 3/18/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonet Transportation and Logistics, Inc. Bush Truck Leasing, Inc. served. (Angert, Mark) (acc). [Transferred from California Southern on 3/18/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Sonet Transportation and Logistics, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued 09/24/2018. Identifying Corporate Parent NORTH STAR GAS, LTD. CO., Other Affiliate Don Smith for Sonet Transportation and Logistics, Inc.. (Angert, Mark) (sjm). (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 3/18/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 3/18/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bush Truck Leasing, Inc., Does 1-10, Vehicle Titling Trust ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11707866.), filed by Sonet Transportation and Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2203-JM-BLM. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Angert, Mark)(tcf) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 3/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonet Transportation and Logistics, Inc. v. Bush Truck Leasing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vehicle Titling Trust
Represented By: Gregory M. Utter
Represented By: Jacob D. Rhode
Represented By: Michael W. Battin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officers Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bush Truck Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory M. Utter
Represented By: Jacob D. Rhode
Represented By: Michael W. Battin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonet Transportation and Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A Yeager
Represented By: Andrew Cole Myers
Represented By: Mark Angert
Represented By: Christopher P. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?