H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. v. Luttrell, Jr.
Plaintiff: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Robert E. Luttrell, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00348
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE: Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 7/19/2019. The Court will thereafter, pursuant to Rule 16(b), enter a Calendar Order or will set and hold a Scheduling Conference after which a Calendar Order will be issued. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Robert E. Luttrell, Jr.. (eh)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Robert E. Luttrell, Jr. (sct)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Gustavson, William)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 5/10/2019. (jlw)
May 9, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert E. Luttrell, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6918060), filed by H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gustavson, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. v. Luttrell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Luttrell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.
Represented By: William Michael Gustavson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?