Onuachi v. Master Builders, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Uju Onuachi
Defendant: Timmermier, Gross & Prentiss, Harry S. Peterson Company, Alliance Group Inc, Master Builders, Inc., Cassem, Adams, Gotch, & Douglas, Pickens, Green & Cleason L.L.P., Meylan Enterprises Inc., Western Waterproofing Co., Inc. and The Western Group
Case Number: 1:2019cv00358
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Monica Sansalone and Salman Shah by Defendant Cassem, Adams, Gotch, & Douglas. (Sansalone, Monica)
July 3, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Strike #21 Reply (non motion) by Plaintiff Uju Onuachi. (bjc)
July 2, 2019 Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in District of Nebraska as case 8:19-cv-00291, filed 07/01/2019. (sct)
July 1, 2019 Case transferred to District of Nebraska.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (eh)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADOPTING #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 7/1/2019. It is ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction and/or for failure to state any claim. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff is forewarned that the complaint in this case appears to be closely related to prior frivolous cases filed in the District of Nebraska as to violate Rule 11, Fed R. Civ. P. and that any future filing in this United States District Court concerning the same subjection mater will be DISMISSED. In the alternative, theCourt TRANSFERS this case to the District of Nebraska for further proceedings, including sanctions if appropriate. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 Reply re #18 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Defendant Alliance Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Prem, Emily)
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Harry S. Peterson Company, Master Builders, Inc., Pickens, Green & Cleason L.L.P., The Western Group, Timmermier, Gross & Prentiss. (sct)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant The Western Group. The Western Group served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (sct)
June 19, 2019 Filing 18 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Uju Onuachi. (sct)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Notation ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time until 6/19/19 to file objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 6/7/19. (wam)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #17 Defendant Cassem, Adams, Gotch, & Douglas' Motion to Stay or Extend Time to Answer to the extent that the deadline for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby STAYED pending this Court's final disposition on the 5/22/2019 Report and Recommendation of the undersigned #6 . In the event that the Report and Recommendation is not adopted by the presiding district judge, Defendant shall have 14 days from the date of the Order to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/6/2019. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay Proceedings or, in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Cassem, Adams, Gotch, & Douglas. (Sansalone, Monica)
June 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses in Opposition to the District Court's Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Uju Onuachi. (jlw)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Defendant Meylan Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Proceedings to the extent that the deadline for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby STAYED pending this Court's final disposition on the 5/22/2019 Report and Recommendation of the undersigned #6 . In the event that the Report and Recommendation is not adopted by the presiding district judge, Meylan shall have 14 days from the date of the Order to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/5/2019. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay by Defendant Meylan Enterprises Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Whittaker, Faith)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Defendant Alliance Group Inc.'s Motion to Stay to the extent that the deadline for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby STAYED pending this Court's final disposition on the 5/22/2019 Report and Recommendation of the undersigned #6 . In the event that the Report and Recommendation is not adopted by the presiding district judge, Alliance shall have 14 days from the date of the Order to answer, move or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 5/30/2019. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified Docket Text on 5/31/2019 (km).
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay by Defendant Alliance Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay) (Prem, Emily)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE: Green card returned signed without a date. USPS does not show that the package was delivered. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Alliance Group Inc, Cassem, Adams, Gotch, & Douglas. Alliance Group Inc served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019; Cassem, Adams, Gotch, & Douglas served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (jlw)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Master Builders, Inc.. (jlw)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Harry S. Peterson Company. (jlw)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Western Waterproofing Co., Inc.. (jlw)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Uju Onuachi. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT this case be DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction and/or for failure to state any claim. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED THAT Plaintiff be forewarned that the instant complaint appears to be so closely related to prior frivolous cases filed in the District of Nebraska as to violate Rule 11, Fed. R. Civ. P., and that any future filings in this U.S. District Court concerning the same subject matter therefore will be summarily dismissed. In the alternative, the undersigned recommends transfer to the District of Nebraska for further proceedings, including sanctions if appropriate. Objections to R&R due by 6/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 5/22/2019. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Pickens, Green & Cleason L.L.P.. (jlw)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Timmermier, Gross & Prentiss. (jlw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (bjc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alliance Group Inc, Cassem, Adams, Gotch, & Douglas, Harry S. Peterson Company, Master Builders, Inc., Meylan Enterprises Inc., Pickens, Green & Cleason L.L.P., The Western Group, Timmermier, Gross & Prentiss, Western Waterproofing Co., Inc.. (jlw)
May 13, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 100cin036749 (jlw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Uju Onuachi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt) (jlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onuachi v. Master Builders, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timmermier, Gross & Prentiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry S. Peterson Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Group Inc
Represented By: Emily Serger Prem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Master Builders, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassem, Adams, Gotch, & Douglas
Represented By: Monica A. Sansalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pickens, Green & Cleason L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meylan Enterprises Inc.
Represented By: Faith Clair Whittaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Waterproofing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Western Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uju Onuachi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?