Jackson v. Eversana Life Science Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Necole Jackson
Defendant: Elizabeth Hollington, Eversana Life Science Services, LLC d/b/a Triplefin, LLC, Julie Harrington, Michael Yates and Eversana Life Science Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00380
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:623
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CALENDAR ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 7/29/2019. Motions directed to pleadings due by 8/16/2019. Motions to Amend due by 8/30/2019. Status Conference set for 9/17/2019 01:30 PM in Teleconference before Judge Timothy S. Black. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 11/15/2019. Lay Witness due by 12/27/2019. Defendant Primary Expert due by 1/2/2020. Rebuttal Expert due by 2/3/2020. Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Dispositive motions due by 3/31/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2020 01:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Timothy S. Black. Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Cincinnati before Judge Timothy S. Black.. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/28/19. (rrs)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry and Notation Order: This civil action came before the Court for a preliminary pretrial conference by telephone on 6/28/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Evan McFarland appeared on behalf of Plaintiff; Matthew Byrne appeared on behalf of Defendants. This case is set for a status conference by telephone on 9/17/2019 at 1:30 p.m. COUNSEL SHALL CALL: 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. A Calendar Order will issue by separate entry. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/28/2019. (rrs)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT of the Parties by Defendants Eversana Life Science Services, LLC, Julie Harrington, Elizabeth Hollington, Michael Yates. (Byrne, Matthew)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Notation Order and Notice of Hearing: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for 6/27/2019 is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 6/28/2019 at 10:00 a.m. COUNSEL SHALL CALL: 1-888-684-8852; Access Code: 8411435; Security Code 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. Before the pretrial conference, counsel shall comply with the MANDATORY pre-preliminary pretrial conference between counsel, as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). THE REPORT MUST BE FILED 7 DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial procedures and forms can be found on our website at: https://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPBlack. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/12/19. (rrs)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Notation Order and Notice of Hearing: A Preliminary Pretrial Conference by telephone is set before Judge Timothy S. Black for 6/27/2019 at 10:00 a.m. COUNSEL SHALL CALL: 1-888-684-8852; Access Code: 8411435; Security Code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. Before the pretrial conference, counsel shall comply with the MANDATORY pre-preliminary pretrial conference between counsel, as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). THE REPORT MUST BE FILED 7 DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial procedures and forms can be found on our website at: https://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPBlack. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 5/30/19. (rrs)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint filed by Eversana Life Science Services, LLC, Julie Harrington, Elizabeth Hollington, Michael Yates. (Byrne, Matthew)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Necole Jackson. Originally filed in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas on 4/17/19. (sct)
May 23, 2019 ***If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (sct)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Eversana Life Science Services, LLC d/b/a Triplefin, LLC, Julie Harrington, Elizabeth Hollington, Michael Yates. (Byrne, Matthew)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A 1901908 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6934867), filed by Michael Yates, Julie Harrington, Eversana Life Science Services, LLC d/b/a Triplefin, LLC, Elizabeth Hollington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Byrne, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Eversana Life Science Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Hollington
Represented By: Matthew Richard Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eversana Life Science Services, LLC d/b/a Triplefin, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Richard Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Harrington
Represented By: Matthew Richard Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Yates
Represented By: Matthew Richard Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eversana Life Science Services, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Richard Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Necole Jackson
Represented By: Evan McFarland
Represented By: Matthew G Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?