Dawson-Durgan v. Warden, Warren Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Donald Dawson-Durgan
Respondent: Warden, Warren Correctional Institution
Case Number: 1:2019cv00382
Filed: May 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 100CIN036928, the check was received by the Clerk's Office on 05/16/2019 and processed today (bjc)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER - Petitioner is therefore ORDERED to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 05/24/2019. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Donald Dawson-Durgan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawson-Durgan v. Warden, Warren Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald Dawson-Durgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Warren Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?