Bruce v. AstraZeneca LP et al
Plaintiff: James E Bruce
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Takeda Development Center Americas Inc., AstraZeneca LP, Merck & Co., Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00438
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 1:19-cv-14171, filed 06/24/2019. (sct)
June 24, 2019 Case transferred to District of New Jersey. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (sct)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from U.S. District Court-District of New Jersey requesting transfer of case pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order re: MDL No. 2789. (Attachments: #1 Conditional Transfer Order) (sct)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Abbott Laboratories, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Merck & Co., Inc., Takeda Development Center Americas Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., filed by James E Bruce in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas case number A 1902634. (bjc) (bjc).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. Judge Susan J. Dlott no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 6/11/2019. (jlw)
June 11, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A 1902634 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6960475), filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, AstraZeneca LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A State Court Record, #4 Exhibit B JPML Transfer Order) (Anderson, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce v. AstraZeneca LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Bruce
Represented By: John D. Holschuh, III
Represented By: John David Holschuh, Jr
Represented By: Brian Patrick O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Development Center Americas Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca LP
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?