Cross County Development Co v. Griffin
Plaintiff: Cross County Development Co
Defendant: Mike Griffin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00476
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 Letter to Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas re Remand to State Court. (eh)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S JUDGMENT affirming #14 ORDER ADOPTING #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 7/18/2019. Defendant's #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. This case is DISMISSED from the docket of this Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. This matter is REMANDED to the state court. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction should be Denied. This matter should be Dismissed from the docket of the Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. This matter should be Remanded to the state court. Objections to R&R due by 7/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 7/1/2019. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 Affidavit in Support of an Emergency Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Defendant Mike Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5) (eh). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 6/28/2019 (eh).
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Cross County Development Co. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Tremper, Frank)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 State Court Record filed by Defendant Mike Griffin. (Attachments: #1 State Court Recort, Part 2, #2 State Court Recort, Part 3, #3 State Court Recort, Part 4, #4 State Court Recort, Part 5) (eh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM originally filed 5/27/2019 in Hamilton County Municipal Court (Case No. 19CV04574) filed by Cross County Development Co. (eh) Modified on 6/26/2019 (eh).
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM against Cross County Development Co originally filed 3/29/2019 in Hamilton County Municipal Court (Case No. 19CV04574) filed by Mike Griffin. (eh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Cross County Development Co originally filed 3/28/2019 in Hamilton County Municipal Court (Case No. 19CV04574) by Mike Griffin. (eh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Counterclaim originally filed 3/27/2019 in Hamilton County Municipal Court (Case No. 19CV04574) filed by Cross County Development Co. (eh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT originally filed 3/27/2019 in Hamilton County Municipal Court (Case No. 19CV04574) by Cross County Development Co. against Mike Griffin. (eh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Cross County Development Co originally filed 3/7/2019 in Hamilton County Municipal Court (Case No. 19CV04574) by Mike Griffin. (eh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT originally filed 2/20/2019 in Hamilton County Municipal Court (Case No. 19CV04574) by Cross County Development Co. against Mike Griffin. (eh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 100CIN037056 (eh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, Case No. A1901789 filed by Mike Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross County Development Co v. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cross County Development Co
Represented By: Frank K. Tremper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?