Castellon-Egan v. Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eva Castellon-Egan
Defendant: Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00579
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Notation Order and Notice of Hearing: A Preliminary Pretrial Conference by telephone is set before Judge Timothy S. Black for 10/11/2019 at 10:30 a.m. COUNSEL SHALL CALL: 1-888-684-8852; Access Code: 8411435; Security Code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. Before the pretrial conference, counsel shall comply with the MANDATORY pre-preliminary pretrial conference between counsel, as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). THE REPORT MUST BE FILED 7 DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial procedures and forms can be found on our website at: https://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPBlack. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/11/19. (rrs)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark B Gerano for Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc. (Gerano, Mark)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc.. (Pryor, Patricia)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Corporate Parent Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc. for Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc... (Pryor, Patricia)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc.. Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (jlw)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bjc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc. (eh)
July 17, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed by Eva Castellon-Egan against Mitsubishi Electronic Automotive Automotive America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7011988),. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Jacobs, Neal) Modified on 7/17/2019 (eh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castellon-Egan v. Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Castellon-Egan
Represented By: Neal D Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc.
Represented By: Mark B Gerano
Represented By: Patricia Anderson Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?