Richard v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kevin T. Richard
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00581
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Referring Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (cb)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Julis for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Julis, Rachel)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Edward A. Wicklund. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/29/2019. (ss)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7017955) of Edward A. Wicklund by Plaintiff Kevin T. Richard. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Brian, Richard)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and sent to the Marshals for service along with USM-285 Forms, copies of the complaint, and copies of the order issuing service. (bjc)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Kevin T. Richard. (bjc)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 07/18/2019. (bjc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kevin T. Richard. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 A: Notice of Decision Unfavorable, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 USM-285 Forms, #9 USM-285 Forms, #10 USM-285 Forms, #11 USM-285 Forms) (Brian, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Rachel Julis
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin T. Richard
Represented By: Richard F Brian
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?