H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. v. Shrawder-Miles
Plaintiff: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.
Defendant: laura Shrawder-Miles
Case Number: 1:2019cv00617
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant laura Shrawder-Miles. laura Shrawder-Miles served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (bjc)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bjc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to laura Shrawder-Miles. (sct)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Gustavson, William)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiff H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Gustavson, William)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (vp)
July 30, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against laura Shrawder-Miles ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7033409), filed by H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Gustavson, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. v. Shrawder-Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: laura Shrawder-Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.
Represented By: William Michael Gustavson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?