Witt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Chris Witt and Chris D Witt, Jr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00651
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (cb) Modified to correct answer deadline on 9/19/2019 (cb).
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kiywhanna LaChic Kellup for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Kellup, Kiywhanna)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Chris Witt. (bjc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and sent to the U.S. Marshals for service along with USM-285 Forms, copies of the complaint, and copies of the order issuing service. (bjc)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 08/12/2019. (bjc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Chris Witt. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form Attorney General of US, #4 Summons Form Commissioner of SS, #5 Summons Form Office of Regional Chief Counsel, #6 Summons Form US Attorney Office, #7 US Marshal forms) (Hollifield, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kiywhanna LaChic Kellup
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Witt
Represented By: Lisa S Hollifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris D Witt, Jr.
Represented By: Lisa S Hollifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?