Treadway Gallery, Inc. v. John Toomey Gallery, Inc.
Plaintiff: Treadway Gallery, Inc.
Defendant: Thomas Vogel, John Toomey Gallery, Inc. d/b/a Toomey & Co. Auctioneers and John Toomey Gallery, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00664
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Notation Order: This matter is before the Court on Defendant Vogels unopposed motion for an extension of time to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint (Doc. 14). For good cause shown, and the reasons stated therein, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Vogels motion (Doc. #14 ) is GRANTED and he shall have up to and including November 11, 2019 to so file. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 10/10/2019. (eh)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, New date requested 11/11/2019. by Defendant Thomas Vogel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cole, Stacy)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant John Toomey Gallery, Inc. c/o Michael Joseph Devine, Registered Agent. (eh)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant John Toomey Gallery, Inc. served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (eh)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re: #1 Complaint and #6 Summons Issued and #10 Alias Summons Issued. (cb)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 ALIAS Summons Issued as to John Toomey Gallery, Inc. (jlw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Alias) (Ziepfel, Chad)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Clerk: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (sct)
August 15, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to John Toomey Gallery, Inc, Thomas Vogel. (jlw)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Roland Bautista for Plaintiff Treadway Gallery, Inc. (Bautista, Philip)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Lawrence Meyer for Plaintiff Treadway Gallery, Inc. (Meyer, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Robert Ziepfel for Plaintiff Treadway Gallery, Inc. (Ziepfel, Chad)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Treadway Gallery, Inc.. (Ziepfel, Chad)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against John Toomey Gallery, Inc. d/b/a Toomey & Co. Auctioneers, Thomas Vogel ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7062309), filed by Treadway Gallery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application Number 1-7758688091, #2 Exhibit B - Application Number 1-7758797884, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ziepfel, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Treadway Gallery, Inc. v. John Toomey Gallery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treadway Gallery, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Roland Bautista
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Meyer
Represented By: Chad Robert Ziepfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Vogel
Represented By: Stacy A Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Toomey Gallery, Inc. d/b/a Toomey & Co. Auctioneers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Toomey Gallery, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?