Teamsters Local Union No. 1199 v. Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.
Plaintiff: Local No. 1199 Teamsters Local Union No. 1199 and Teamsters Local Union No. 1199
Defendant: Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00732
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
2 Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc., filed by Teamsters Local Union No. 1199. (daf)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/31/2019. (daf)
October 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Teamsters Local Union No. 1199. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint) (Ford, Julie)
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, or In the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment ( Responses due by 10/24/2019) by Defendant Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.. (Niedecken, Brooke)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 Transcript of Temporary Restraining Order Proceedings held on September 24, 2019, before Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Darla J. Coulter, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office.. Redaction Request due 10/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2019. (Coulter, Darla)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #2 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 9/24/2019. (cmw)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Temporary Restraining Order Hearing held on 9/24/2019. (Court Reporter: Darla Coulter) (cmw)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Teamsters Local Union No. 1199. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Randall A. Verst and Exhibits) (Ford, Julie)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Arthur T. Carter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/19/2019. (er)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7112914) of Arthur T. Carter by Defendant Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Carter Certificate of Good Standing) (Niedecken, Brooke)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Niedecken, Brooke)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 9/24/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Rule 65.1 Telephone Status Conference held on 9/17/2019. (Court Reporter: Darla Coulter) (cmw)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Application for Restraining Order ECF No. #2 is due by the end of today, 9/17/2019. Plaintiff's reply is due on 9/20/2019. The Court will conduct a hearing regarding Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order on 9/24/2019 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 9/17/2019. (cmw)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke Elizabeth Niedecken for Defendant Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc. (Niedecken, Brooke)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 65.1 Telephone Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Teleconference before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - This case is assigned to U.S. District Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/17/2019. (cmw)
September 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 9/11/2019 as to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction; Julie Ford and John Doll appeared with Randy Verst for plaintiff; Brooke Neidecken appeared for defendant; the Court established a briefing schedule: Responses due by 9/17/2019. Replies due by 9/20/2019; the Court will follow up with the parties regarding a hearing date and/or the availability of another Judge. (ba)
September 9, 2019 Minute entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 9/9/2019 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction; Julie Ford and John Doll, along with non-attorney Randal Verst, the President of Plaintiff, appeared for Plaintiff; Brook Niedeken and Arthur Carter appeared for Defendant; parties agreed to confer and report back at a follow up telephone conference which is scheduled for 9/9/2019 at 05:00 PM by teleconference between Judge Michael R. Barrett; Due to the congestion of the Court's calendar; the status conference will remain set for 9/11/2019 but at 05:15 PM and will be conducted by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett - the parties are instructed to initiate contact with the Court by calling 513-564-7660 five minutes prior to 5:15 pm; Plaintiff is responsible for notifying opposing counsel regarding change in the Court's contact information as set forth above. (ba)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.. (jlw)
September 4, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum by Plaintiff Local No. 1199 Teamsters Local Union No. 1199. (Ford, Julie). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 9/4/2019 (jlw).
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Request for Injunctive Relief against Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7090633), filed by Local No. 1199 Teamsters Local Union No. 1199. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Summons Form) (Ford, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teamsters Local Union No. 1199 v. Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur T. Carter
Represented By: Brooke Elizabeth Niedecken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local No. 1199 Teamsters Local Union No. 1199
Represented By: Julie C Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local Union No. 1199
Represented By: Julie C Ford
Represented By: John Robert Doll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?